Book contents
- Frontmatter
- Dedication
- Contents
- About the author
- Acknowledgements
- Preface
- One Conservatism, the ‘modern’ Conservative Party and the welfare state
- Two From war to peace: the Conservatives and the welfare state in the 1940s
- Three Towards a One Nation Conservative welfare state? The Conservatives and the welfare state, 1950-64
- Four The Heath ‘interregnum’: modern technocratic Conservatism and the welfare state, 1965-74
- Five The Conservative (counter-) revolution: neo-liberal Conservatism and the welfare state, 1974-97
- Six Progressive neo-liberal Conservatism and the welfare state, 2005-15
- Epilogue The Conservative Party and the welfare state: clear blue water?
- Postscript
- Appendix: Selected ministerial posts in Conservative and Conservative-led governments, 1940-2015
- Notes
- References
- Index
Appendix: Selected ministerial posts in Conservative and Conservative-led governments, 1940-2015
Published online by Cambridge University Press: 07 March 2022
- Frontmatter
- Dedication
- Contents
- About the author
- Acknowledgements
- Preface
- One Conservatism, the ‘modern’ Conservative Party and the welfare state
- Two From war to peace: the Conservatives and the welfare state in the 1940s
- Three Towards a One Nation Conservative welfare state? The Conservatives and the welfare state, 1950-64
- Four The Heath ‘interregnum’: modern technocratic Conservatism and the welfare state, 1965-74
- Five The Conservative (counter-) revolution: neo-liberal Conservatism and the welfare state, 1974-97
- Six Progressive neo-liberal Conservatism and the welfare state, 2005-15
- Epilogue The Conservative Party and the welfare state: clear blue water?
- Postscript
- Appendix: Selected ministerial posts in Conservative and Conservative-led governments, 1940-2015
- Notes
- References
- Index
Summary
Period 1: The coalition (10 May 1940 to 23 May 1945) and national caretaker government (23 May 1945 to 26 July 1945) era
Prime Minister
Winston Churchill: 10 May 1940 to 26 July 1945
Chancellor of the Exchequer
Sir Kingsley Wood: 12 May 1940 to 21 September 1943
Sir John Anderson: 24 September 1943 to 26 July 1945
Education (Board of Education, 1940-44; Department of Education 1944-45)1
Hewald Ramsbottam: 3 April 1940 to 20 July 1941
R.A.Butler: 20 July 1941 to 3 August 1944
Richard Law: 3 August 1944 to 25 May 1945
Health
Malcolm MacDonald: (National Labour) 13 May 1940 to 8 February 1941
Ernest Brown: (National Liberal) 8 February 1941 to 11 November 1943
Henry Willink: 11 November 1943 to 26 July 1945
Social security
Ministry of Pensions
Sir Walter Womersley: 7 June 1939 to 26 July 1945
Ministry of Social/National Insurance
Sir William Jowitt: (Labour) 8 October 1944 to 23 May 1945
Leslie Hore-Belisha: (National Independent) 25 May 1945 to 26 July 1945
Period 2: From Churchill to Douglas Home (26 October 1951 to 16 October 1964)
Prime Minister
Winston Churchill: 26 October 1951 to 6 April 1955
Anthony Eden: 6 April 1955 to 10 January 1957
Harold Macmillan: 10 January 1957 to 19 October 1963
Alec Douglas-Home: 19 October 1963 to 16 October 1964
Chancellor of the Exchequer
R.A.Butler: 26 October 1951 to 20 December 1955
Harold Macmillan: 20 December 1955 to 13 January, 1957
Peter Thornycroft: 13 January 1957 to 6 January 1958
Derick Heathcoat-Amory: 6 January 1958 to 27 July 1960
Selwyn Lloyd: 27 July 1960 to 13 July 1962
Reginald Maudling: 13 July 1962 to16 October 1964
Education (Department of Education, 1951-64)
Florence Horsborugh: 2 November 1951 to 18 October 1954
David Eccles: 18 October 1954 to 13 January 1957
Lord Hailsham: 13 January 1957 to 17 September 1957
Geoffrey Lloyd: 17 September 1957 to 14 October 1959
David Eccles: 14 October, 1959 to 13 July 1962
Sir Edward Boyle: 13 July 1962 to 1 April 1964
Quintin Hogg: 1 April 1964 to 16 October 1964
Health
Harry Crookshank: 30 October 1951 to 7 May 1952
Iain Macleod: 7 May 1952 to 20 December 1955
- Type
- Chapter
- Information
- Clear Blue Water?The Conservative Party and the Welfare State since 1940, pp. 151 - 156Publisher: Bristol University PressPrint publication year: 2015